Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho Ribeiro

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1603AppointedBishop of Ceuta and Tanger, Spain
29 Jul 1613AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
12 Jul 1621DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Agostinho Ribeiro
Bishop Agostinho Ribeiro (died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBahia

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast