Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cesare Riario

Deceased

Administrator of Málaga, Spain

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1480Born
3 Jun 149918.7AppointedAdministrator of Pisa, Italy
1506²25.3Ordained BishopAdministrator of Pisa, Italy
6 Oct 150626.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
3 Sep 151838.0AppointedAdministrator of Málaga, Spain
18 Dec 154060.3DiedAdministrator of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Riario
Patriarch Cesare Riario (born , died ) Administrator of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlacePadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 34.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102, and Page 233
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 23, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 216
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,506, Number 48*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast