Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ruprecht von Bayern (Rhein)

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Freising, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1481Born
1 Aug 149514.2SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
8 Feb 149614.7ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
3 Dec 149817.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Freising, Germany
19 Jul 150423.1DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ruprecht von Bayern (Rhein) (VIAF: 261353456)
Father Ruprecht von Bayern (Rhein) (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Freising

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 156
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast