Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp von Rhein

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1480BornHeidelberg
21 Feb 149716.8Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
17 May 149919.0AppointedBishop of Freising, Germany
17 Oct 150727.4Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
5 Jan 154160.7DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp von Rhein:
Bishop Philipp von Rhein (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013