Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franciscus de Paula Reyes

Deceased

Priest

Titular Bishop of Dora

Auxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

Titular See: (refused)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1815Born
15 Feb 184125.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 187458.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
16 Jan 187458.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora

MicroData Summary for Franciscus de Paula Reyes
Father Franciscus de Paula Reyes (born ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantafé, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 250
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017