Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Révay

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1748BornCraszko, Slovakia
1770¹21.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 178739.3SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
7 Apr 178839.6ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
20 Aug 178840.0InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
9 Jan 180657.4DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ján Révay
Bishop Ján Révay (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

  • a priest for 36.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 369
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016