Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar do Rego da Fonseca

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1632AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Nov 1632AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
5 Nov 1635SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
9 Jun 1636ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
13 Jul 1639DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Gaspar do Rego da Fonseca:
Bishop Gaspar do Rego da Fonseca (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 327, and Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013