Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Carmelo DomÍnico Recchia, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1921Born
4 Aug 194624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
7 Dec 197654.9ConfirmedAbbot of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Mar 197755.2InstalledAbbot of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Mar 199977.2RetiredAbbot of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Aug 201593.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Claraval, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carmelo DomÍnico Recchia
Abbot Carmelo DomÍnico Recchia O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Claraval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSora, Italy

  • a priest for 69.0 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 30 Aug 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018