Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Recanati Capodiferro

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1502¹Born
6 Feb 154239.6AppointedBishop of Nice, France
1544²41.5ResignedBishop-Elect of Nice, France
30 Jul 154442.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
19 Dec 154442.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 154542.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
1 Dec 155957.4DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Recanati Capodiferro (VIAF: 86355921)
Girolamo Cardinal Recanati Capodiferro (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria della Pace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 14.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257, and Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018