Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Reade

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1368AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
2 Sep 1369Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
18 Aug 1385DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Reade:
Bishop William Reade (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 187
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 243
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,444
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013