Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Reade

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Sep 1394AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
26 Jan 1396AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
5 Oct 1396AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
Jun 1415³DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Reade
Bishop Robert Reade (died Jun 1415) Bishop of Chichester

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 187, and Page 289
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 236
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 308
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast