Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Razzolini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santorini {Thira}, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1687Born
14 Dec 173952.8AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
25 Jul 174053.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
7 May 174659.2ResignedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
4 Aug 177588.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Razzolini
Bishop Francesco Antonio Razzolini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santorini {Thira}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsilo

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 366
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018