Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de la Raya Navarrete

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536²Born
6 Jun 159458.4AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
27 Nov 159458.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
28 Jul 160670.5DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de la Raya Navarrete
Bishop Antonio de la Raya Navarrete (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaeza, Diocese of Jaén, Spain
Ordained BishopGranada, Archdiocese of Granada, Spain
Death PlaceCuzco, Diocese of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,090
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,291
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 106, Number 674
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast