Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Rauch, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular See: Natura


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1546AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Feb 1547Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
2 Nov 1558DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Rauch:
Bishop Peter Rauch O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013