Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elzéar de Rastel

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Nov 1577AppointedBishop of Riez, France
21 Dec 1577Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
28 Oct 1597DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Elzéar de Rastel
Bishop Elzéar de Rastel (died ) Bishop of Riez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavaillon, Vaucluse
Death PlaceCavaillon

  • a bishop for 19.8 years

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,577, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast