Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Rapado

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Feb 1424AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
20 Jul 1425AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
11 Jul 1442AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
1444¹DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Rapado
Bishop Diego Rapado (died 1444) Bishop of Oviedo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 501, and Page 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 7 Apr 2020

Quantcast