Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Burkhard von Randegg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Dec 1462SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
14 Jan 1463ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
26 Mar 1463Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 1463Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
13 Apr 1466DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Burkhard von Randegg
Bishop Burkhard von Randegg (died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 3.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,618
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast