Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ramírez de Guzmán

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jun 1390AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
28 Jan 1394AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
30 Jul 1403AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
1424¹DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ramírez de Guzmán
Bishop Juan Ramírez de Guzmán (died 1424) Bishop of Ávila

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 501, and Page 156
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 7 Apr 2020

Quantcast