Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni di Ragusa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ardjisch (Arges; Argesch), Romania

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pseudocardinal of Felix V)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1395¹Born
10 Oct 143843.7SelectedBishop of Ardjisch (Arges; Argesch), Romania
8 Feb 143944.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ardjisch (Arges; Argesch), Romania
20 Oct 1443³48.8DiedBishop of Ardjisch (Arges; Argesch), Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni di Ragusa
Bishop Giovanni di Ragusa O.P. (born 1395, died ) Bishop of Ardjisch (Arges; Argesch)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a bishop for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1440
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018