Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Radziwiłł

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1476Born
30 May 150226.4AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
10 Sep 150731.6AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Apr 151943.2DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Radziwiłł
Bishop Wojciech Radziwiłł (born 1476, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018