Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolaus Radovani

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1714¹BornShkodrė
23 Sep 174329.7AppointedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
18 Dec 175238.9AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
16 May 177460.3DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Radovani:
Archbishop Nicolaus Radovani (born 1714, died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203, and Page 384
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015