Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Vigil de Quiñones y Labiada

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547²BornSan Vicente de Caldones
13 Aug 160760.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
18 Jul 161669.5AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
1 Sep 161770.7DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Vigil de Quiñones y Labiada:
Bishop Juan Vigil de Quiñones y Labiada (died ) Bishop of Segovia

Source(s):
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 310, and Page 357
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 123, Number 781

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013