Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Quarantotti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1733Born
1809²75.2AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
1814²80.2ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
8 Mar 181682.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Jul 181682.8Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 181682.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
10 May 182086.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
15 Sep 182086.9DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Quarantotti
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Quarantotti (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 4.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast