Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Quaglia

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1802BornCorneto, Italy
27 Sep 186159.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 186159.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
27 Aug 1872³70.0DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Quaglia:
Cardinal Angelo Quaglia (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013