Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Dominik Puzyna

Deceased

Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1690³BornDelaciszki
25 Jul 171323.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 174050.5AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
8 Jan 174150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
5 Mar 175262.0DiedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Dominik Puzyna:
Bishop Józef Dominik Puzyna (died ) Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 23 Sep 2013