Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich Putsch

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1428AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
10 May 1428Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Aug 1437DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ulrich Putsch:
Bishop Ulrich Putsch (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 148
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013