Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Puteo (del Pozzo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
13 Jan 156228.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 156228.9AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
24 Jan 156329.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
28 May 158753.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
15 Apr 158955.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
14 Jul 159258.5DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Puteo (del Pozzo) (VIAF: 36555170)
Archbishop Antonio Puteo (del Pozzo) (born 1534, died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,110
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016