Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Puigmartí Funes, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1575³BornElna-Perpiñán
23 Dec 160025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Dec 163055.1AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
163155.1Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
Nov 1632³56.9DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Puigmartí Funes:
Bishop Pedro Puigmartí Funes O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013