Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achille Puglia

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1691BornLaurino
24 Feb 172028.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 173745.2AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
5 Feb 177381.2DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Achille Puglia:
Bishop Achille Puglia (died ) Bishop of Nicastro

  • a priest for 52.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013