Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de la Puebla González

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1643³Born
17 Dec 166724.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 169451.4AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
29 Jul 169552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
1 Mar 169955.7InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
21 Jan 170460.6DiedBishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Puebla González
Bishop Francisco de la Puebla González (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlacePradera de Sepulveda, Spain

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 237, Number 1,472
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017