Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walerian Protosewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
27 May 154944.4AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
1555¹50.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
10 Apr 155651.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1579²74.0DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walerian Protosewicz
Bishop Walerian Protosewicz (born 1505, died 1579) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKrajsku

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Jun 2015
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 229
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast