Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Matteo Cardinal Priuli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577Born
19 Sep 161639.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 161639.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
23 Jun 162144.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
13 Mar 162447.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

MicroData Summary for Matteo Priuli (VIAF: 89100794)
Matteo Cardinal Priuli (born 1577, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1616

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast