Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Priuli

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1596³BornVenice
8 Feb 162730.3AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
4 Oct 1632³35.9DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Priuli:
Bishop Agostino Priuli (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015