Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Priuli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1650BornVenice, Italy
18 May 171261.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jul 171261.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
28 May 171463.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
15 Mar 172069.5DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

MicroData Summary for Luigi Priuli:
Cardinal Luigi Priuli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

  • a cardinal for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013