Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jozef Daniel Pravda, S.D.B.

Superior Emeritus of Baku, Azerbaijan

Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1950 Born
15 Aug 196919.1ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Jun 197726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Aug 197828.1Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Oct 200050.2AppointedSuperior of Baku, Azerbaijan
18 Jul 200353.0ResignedSuperior of Baku, Azerbaijan

MicroData Summary for Jozef Daniel Pravda
Father Jozef Daniel Pravda S.D.B. (born ) Superior Emeritus of Baku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlatnč, Slovakia

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Baku.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018