Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Pott, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Xinyang [Sinyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1903Born
30 Sep 193229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Mar 195147.5AppointedBishop of Xinyang [Sinyang], China
6 Feb 195349.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Xinyang [Sinyang], China
11 Apr 198682.6DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Xinyang [Sinyang], China

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pott
Father Antonio Pott S.V.D. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Xinyang [Sinyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDörenthe, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Death PlaceNeuenkirchen

  • a priest for 53.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1953
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast