Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eduard Karl Gaston Pöttickh de Pettenegg, O.T. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop-Elect of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1847Born
29 Jun 190356.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Teutonic Knights of Saint Mary’s Hospital in Jerusalem
14 Nov 190457.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
4 Oct 191871.3DiedTitular Archbishop-Elect of Tamiathis

MicroData Summary for Eduard Karl Gaston Pöttickh de Pettenegg
Father Eduard Karl Gaston Pöttickh de Pettenegg O.T. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop-Elect of Tamiathis

EventPlace
Birth PlacePepensfeld

  • a priest for 15.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: CB, 27 May 2013
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast