Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Pongrácz

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
1 Jun 167038.4SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
2 May 167240.3ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
12 Jun 167240.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
5 Mar 167644.1DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for György Pongrácz
Bishop György Pongrácz (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOwar

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 402
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast