Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Pongelli (Pungelli)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1669³Born
25 Mar 170434.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172151.7AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
3 May 174879.0ResignedBishop of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Pongelli (Pungelli)
Bishop Teodoro Pongelli (Pungelli) (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Anatolia

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018