Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffroy de Melie de Pompadour

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1430Born
24 Jul 146535.1AppointedBishop of Angoulême, France
6 Jul 147040.1AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
15 Mar 148655.8AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
8 May 151483.9DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy de Melie de Pompadour
Bishop Geoffroy de Melie de Pompadour (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 89
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1465, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast