Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Polton

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1420AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
21 Jul 1420Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 1421AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
27 Feb 1426AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1433DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Polton:
Bishop Thomas Polton (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,454
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 187, and Page 274
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 245, and Page 464
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 60
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 268
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013