Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Ildebrando Polliuti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1854Born
8 Jan 189944.3AppointedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
10 Sep 191763.0DiedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ildebrando Polliuti
Abbot Ildebrando Polliuti O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast