Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Polenz, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Samland (Sambia), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹Born
23 Mar 151941.2AppointedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
30 May 152547.4ResignedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
28 Apr 155072.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Samland (Sambia), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg von Polenz (VIAF: 42634046)
Bishop Georg von Polenz O.T. (born 1478, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Samland (Sambia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast