Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Poitiers

Deceased

Bishop of Langres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1390AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
20 Sep 1413AppointedBishop of Langres, France
7 Dec 1433DiedBishop of Langres, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Poitiers
Bishop Charles de Poitiers (died ) Bishop of Langres

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 307, and Page 175
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast