Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wichard von Pohlheim

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1280Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
21 Aug 1280AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
23 Nov 1282DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wichard von Pohlheim
Bishop Wichard von Pohlheim (died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a bishop for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 392
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,768
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast