Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Poggio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tropea, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1493Born
4 Oct 154148.6AppointedBishop of Tropea, Italy
20 Nov 155158.8Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 155259.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
6 Feb 155663.0ResignedBishop of Tropea, Italy
12 Feb 155663.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Poggio (VIAF: 67349803)
Giovanni Cardinal Poggio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tropea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)S. Jacopo, Chapel, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna

  • a cardinal for 4.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018