Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Donatien Plissonneau, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Foumban, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1883Born
23 Sep 190319.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
21 May 191026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
7 Feb 192036.2AppointedPrefect of Adamaua, Cameroon
11 Jun 192339.6AppointedPrefect of Foumban, Cameroon
193046.1ResignedPrefect of Foumban, Cameroon
25 Jan 194864.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Foumban, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Joseph Donatien Plissonneau
Father Joseph Donatien Plissonneau S.C.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Foumban

EventPlace
Birth PlacePont St-Martin
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.6 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Dec 2018

Quantcast