Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Platzheim-Lenzburg

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1359AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
14 Feb 1364AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
6 Aug 1374DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johann von Platzheim-Lenzburg
Bishop Johann von Platzheim-Lenzburg (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 270, and Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast