Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geoffrey Plantagenet

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1152¹Born
May 1173³21.3SelectedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
Jul 1175³23.5ConfirmedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
6 Jan 118230.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
10 Aug 118937.6SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
16 Sep 118937.7ConfirmedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
23 Sep 118937.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 119139.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 121260.9DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey Plantagenet
Archbishop Geoffrey Plantagenet (born 1152, died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTours, Archdiocese of Tours, France
Death PlaceGrandmont

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 51
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 101
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 8
  • ab/op/c1: CB, 20 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast