Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Planitz

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1411SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
11 Mar 1411ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
31 May 1411Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
23 May 1427DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Planitz:
Bishop Rudolf von Planitz (died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 345
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,813

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013